Reports for Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH
- Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH from Kriens operates in the sector «Other services in education» and is active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.08.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-111.717.982.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Amir Bau GmbH, Marketdeer. / André Wilhelmus.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.06.2004
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.028.213-6
UID/VAT
CHE-111.717.982
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung einer Wassersportschule, insbesondere für Motor- und Segelboote; Durchführung von Bootsfahrten und Events; Vermietungen; Erwerb, Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Verwertung von Patenten, Lizenzen und Herstellungsverfahren; Handel mit Waren und Erzeugnissen aller Art; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken; Tätigung treuhänderischer Geschäfte; Beteiligungen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005817398, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH, in Greppen, CHE-111.717.982, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 13.04.2012, S.0, Publ. 6635990).
Statutenänderung:
20.07.2023.
Sitz neu:
Kriens.
Domizil neu:
Grosshaslistrasse 7, 6010 Kriens.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Vinkulierungsbestimmungen wurden aus den Statuten entfernt.]. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gabriel, Silvia, von Ennetbürgen, in Greppen, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gabriel, Beat, von Ennetbürgen, in Emmen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Greppen, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00].
Publication number: 6635990, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH, in Greppen, CH-100.4.028.213-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 22.06.2004, S. 9, Publ. 2320282).
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief.
Vinkulierung neu:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 01.04.2012 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Publication number: 2320282, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Gabriel Waterbase.ch GmbH, in Greppen, Chriesbaumhofstrasse 28, 6404 Greppen, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
15.06.2004.
Zweck:
Führung einer Wassersportschule, insbesondere für Motor- und Segelboote;
Durchführung von Bootsfahrten und Events;
Vermietungen;
Erwerb, Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Verwertung von Patenten, Lizenzen und Herstellungsverfahren;
Handel mit Waren und Erzeugnissen aller Art;
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken;
Tätigung treuhänderischer Geschäfte;
Beteiligungen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Eingetragene Personen:
Gabriel, Beat, von Ennetbürgen, in Greppen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--;
Gabriel, Silvia, von Ennetbürgen, in Greppen, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.