Address
c/o IG group SA
Route de Chandoline 25b
1950 Sion
Reports for Gabarits Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gabarits Sàrl
- Gabarits Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Sion, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- Gabarits Sàrl was founded on 19.02.1996.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 25.01.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-108.469.453.
- On the same address there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: AJD Cuisines-bains Sàrl, Borne Jollien SA, Frialp Holding SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.02.1996
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.441.288-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.469.453
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vente, location et pose de gabarits pour enquête. La société exploite la marque Gabarits (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gabarits Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005082724, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Gabarits Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-108.469.453, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 246 du 17.12.2020, Publ. 1005051153).
Autres adresses:
c/o Didier Aregger, Chemin de la Buchille 65, 1630 Bulle.
Publication number: HR02-1005051153, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Gabarits Sàrl, précédemment à Bulle, CHE-108.469.453, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 7031578 du 24.01.2013).
Modification des statuts:
01.12.2020.
Nouveau siège:
Sion.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o IG group SA, Route de Chandoline 25b, 1950 Sion.
Nouvelles communications:
Communication aux associés: par n'importe quel moyen de transmission écrit (courrier écrit ou électronique, télécopie, etc.).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
RESO SA Technique & Gestion du Territoire (CHE-106.755.184), à Bulle, associée, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Choffet, Henri René, de Le Locle, à Châtel-sur-Montsalvens, gérant, avec signature collective à deux;
Barbey, Bertrand André, de Morlon, à Bulle, gérant, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Aregger, Didier, de Wisen (SO), à Bulle, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: de Willisau, à Willisau, président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, sans part sociale];
Hauser Aregger, Véronique, de Chéserex, à Bulle, gérante, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Publication number: HR02-1005050508, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Gabarits Sàrl, à Bulle, CHE-108.469.453 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg, par suite du transfert du siège à Sion.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.