Reports for FundRock Switzerland SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FundRock Switzerland SA
- FundRock Switzerland SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Gland. FundRock Switzerland SA belongs to the industry «Fund management» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 28.04.2014.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 13.06.2024.
- FundRock Switzerland SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-469.632.850.
- There are 17 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: AIMsight SA, AMIQUAM SA, Dôme Immobilier-Management Sàrl.
Management (6)
newest board members
Anne Elisabeth Marie Juliette Empain,
Tasneem Jeevanjee,
Renaud Oury
newest authorized signatories
Anne Elisabeth Marie Juliette Empain,
Elisa Sourmelis,
Stephen Allen,
Tasneem Jeevanjee,
Renaud Oury
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.04.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Gland
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.149.748-4
UID/VAT
CHE-469.632.850
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la représentation en Suisse de placement collectifs étrangers, ainsi que la promotion de placement collectifs en Suisse ou à partir de la Suisse. La société peut en outre: - exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but, à l'exclusion de toutes opérations prohibées par la LFAIE; - créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; - participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; - accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Genève | 02.08.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | 01.05.2014 | 01.08.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ARM Swiss Representatives SA
- ARM Swiss Reprensentatives SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FundRock Switzerland SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006056492, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FundRock Switzerland SA, à Gland, CHE-469.632.850 (FOSC du 04.12.2023, p. 0/1005900418). La signature de Taylor Gregory est radiée. Empain Anne est nommée présidente. Oury Renaud n'est plus président. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Allen Stephen, de Royaume-Uni, à Collonge-Bellerive, et Sourmelis Elisa, de France, à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005900418, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FundRock Switzerland SA, à Gland, CHE-469.632.850 (FOSC du 02.08.2022, p. 0/1005533393). Zufferey Jean Baptiste et Parain Xavier ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Oury Renaud est nommé président. Jeevanjee Tasneem, de et à Anières, est membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005533393, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FundRock Switzerland SA, à Gland, CHE-469.632.850 (FOSC du 18.05.2022, p. 0/1005476959). PricewaterhouseCoopers SA (CHE-390.062.005) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Deloitte SA (CHE-411.931.790), à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.