Reports for Tierwohlstiftung Bernina
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tierwohlstiftung Bernina
- Tierwohlstiftung Bernina is currently active and the industry «Performance of various services». The legal headquarters are in Scuol.
- The organization was founded on 01.07.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 14.06.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-114.394.970.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Boris Rapp,
Dr. med. vet. Benjamin Biner,
Enrico Clavadetscher
newest authorized signatories
Boris Rapp,
Dr. med. vet. Benjamin Biner,
Enrico Clavadetscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Scuol
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.894-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.394.970
Sector
Performance of various services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Aufnahme, Unterbringung, Versorgung und Vermittlung von herrenlosen Tieren sowie Tieren, bei denen die Tierhalterinnen die Betreuung nicht weiter übernehmen können; Anlaufstelle für Behörden bei tierwohlrelevanten Sachverhalten; Finanzielle Unterstützung bei medizinisch notwendigen tiermedizinischen Behandlungen oder Eingriffen (inkl. Euthanasie) bei bedürftigen Tierhalterinnen; Unterstützung bei der Fort- und Weiterbildung von Fachpersonal (z.B. Tierärztinnen, Tierpflegerinnen, Praktikant(lnn)en und tiermedizinische Praxisassistentinnen) sowie bei der Aufrechterhaltung einer qualitativ hochstehenden tiermedizinischen Versorgung.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Accontaris Treuhand AG | Zug | 23.08.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Taverna Treuhand AG | Scuol | 12.01.2016 | 22.08.2021 | |
Wieser & Wieser AG, Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft | Zuoz | 07.07.2008 | 26.11.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fundaziun Pro bes-chas orfnas Ramosch / Pro Tierwaisenheim Ramosch
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tierwohlstiftung Bernina
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006057488, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Fundaziun Pro bes-chas orfnas Ramosch / Pro Tierwaisenheim Ramosch, in Valsot, CHE-114.394.970, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2021, Publ. 1005275780).
Urkundenänderung:
04.03.2024.
Name neu:
Tierwohlstiftung Bernina.
Sitz neu:
Scuol.
Domizil neu:
c/o Clinica Alpina SA, Buorna , 7550 Scuol.
Zweck neu:
Aufnahme, Unterbringung, Versorgung und Vermittlung von herrenlosen Tieren sowie Tieren, bei denen die Tierhalterinnen die Betreuung nicht weiter übernehmen können;
Anlaufstelle für Behörden bei tierwohlrelevanten Sachverhalten;
Finanzielle Unterstützung bei medizinisch notwendigen tiermedizinischen Behandlungen oder Eingriffen (inkl. Euthanasie) bei bedürftigen Tierhalterinnen;
Unterstützung bei der Fort- und Weiterbildung von Fachpersonal (z.B. Tierärztinnen, Tierpflegerinnen, Praktikant(lnn)en und tiermedizinische Praxisassistentinnen) sowie bei der Aufrechterhaltung einer qualitativ hochstehenden tiermedizinischen Versorgung.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Conradin, Belinda, von Sent und Santa Maria Val Müstair, in Ramosch (Valsot), Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bischoff, Dr. Men, von Ramosch, in Sent, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Guggisberg, Verena, von Zollikon, in Zollikerberg (Zollikon), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häfner, Erich, von Klosters-Serneus, in Strada (Valsot), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lauber, Martin, von Marbach LU und Rickenbach LU, in Scuol, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rapp, Boris, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Weggis, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Biner, Benjamin, von Zermatt, in S-chanf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Clavadetscher, Enrico, von Küblis, in Eitweg (AT), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.