Reports for FTF International AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FTF International AG
- FTF International AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Trading in IT and communications products» and is active.
- FTF International AG was founded on 13.08.2019.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 09.08.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company FTF International AG is registered under the UID CHE-222.625.089.
- On the same address as FTF International AG there are 23 other active companies registered. These include: Aquilas Company Builder AG, Aquilas Holding (Schweiz) AG, beyoul AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.08.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.047.682-8
UID/VAT
CHE-222.625.089
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel und Vertrieb von Software, weiteren Produkten und Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Telekommunikation, öffentliche Sicherheit, Zugriffskontrolle, Handel & Marketing. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FTF International AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005812576, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FTF International AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.625.089, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 11.12.2020, Publ. 1005045039).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haas, Jürgen Hans, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Esztergom (HU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imre, Gabor, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lugano, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005045039, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FTF International AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.625.089, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2019, Publ. 1004696936).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vuilliomenet, Benoit, von Val-de-Ruz, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR01-1004696936, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FTF International AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.625.089, Ernst-Nobs-Platz 1, 8004 Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
02.08.2019.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel und Vertrieb von Software, weiteren Produkten und Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Telekommunikation, öffentliche Sicherheit, Zugriffskontrolle, Handel & Marketing. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 50'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 02.08.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Imre, Gabor, ungarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lugano, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Haas, Jürgen Hans, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Esztergom (HU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Vuilliomenet, Benoit, von Val-de-Ruz, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.