Reports for Forner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Forner AG
- Forner AG in Luzern is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Research and development». Forner AG is active.
- The management of the company Forner AG consists of 2 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.08.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Forner AG is the following: CHE-103.432.649.
- AI Simplicity GmbH, ATELIER BRANDAU CICCARDINI Architekten FH SIA GmbH, Blaser Meewes & Partner AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.06.1967
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.007.378-4
UID/VAT
CHE-103.432.649
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Forschung und Entwicklung auf dem Gebiet der chemisch-technischen Produkte; Handel mit Hard- und Software; Handel mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere Handel mit Fahrzeugen und Ersatzteilen; Ausführung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Versicherungen, Vorsorge und Finanzen sowie Vermittlung der Geschäfte im genannten Bereich; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum, Urheberrechten, Patenten und Lizenzen aller Art.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Team Treuhand AG | Ebikon | 25.05.2004 | 02.07.2009 | |
ABN Atlas Beratungen AG, Nebikon in Liquidation | Nebikon | <2004 | 24.05.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Künzler + Baumann AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Forner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116997, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forner AG, in Luzern, CHE-103.432.649, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 22.02.2021, Publ. 1005106482).
Domizil neu:
St.-Karli-Strasse 13c, 6004 Luzern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Musso Balestri, Francesa, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelprokura].
Publication number: HR02-1005106482, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forner AG, in Luzern, CHE-103.432.649, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 13.05.2020, Publ. 1004888421).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Musso, Adriano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Musso Balestri, Francesa, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1004888421, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Forner AG, in Luzern, CHE-103.432.649, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 30.04.2020, Publ. 1004880157).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brücker, Antonia, von Spiringen, in Hochdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Musso, Adriano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.