Address
c/o Emile Egger & Cie SA
Route de Neuchâtel 36
2088 Cressier NE
Reports for Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A.
- Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A. with its legal headquarters in Cressier NE is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A. is active.
- The management of the organization Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A. consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 10.01.1987.
- The last commercial register change was made on 15.01.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A. is registered under the UID CHE-109.769.113.
- Egger Appro SA, Egger Immo SA, EGGER Pumps Technology SA are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dominique François Glauser,
Gérard François Biétry,
Béatrice Odette Egger
newest authorized signatories
Dominique François Glauser,
Gérard François Biétry,
Béatrice Odette Egger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.1987
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Cressier (NE)
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.0.401.269-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.769.113
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La prévoyance en faveur du personnel de la fondatrice et des entreprises qui lui sont économiquement ou financièrement étroitement liées.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Neuchâtel | 15.01.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
reviXpert SA | Milvignes | 11.12.2017 | 14.01.2024 | |
Hagmann Treuhand AG | Bern | 31.08.2007 | 10.12.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005934670, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A., à Cressier (NE), CHE-109.769.113 (FOSC du 15.11.2023, p. 0/1005885833). "reviXpert SA" (CHE-291.004.228) n'est plus organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
"MAZARS SA" (CHE-463.790.686), succursale à Neuchâtel.
Publication number: HR02-1005885833, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A., à Cressier (NE), CHE-109.769.113 (FOSC du 21.09.2022, p. 0/1005566490). Antongiovanni Christian et Jenzer Roland ne sont plus membres du conseil de fondation;
leurs pouvoirs sont radiés. Biétry Gérard François, de Bonfol, à Mont-Vully, et Glauser Dominique, de Fraubrunnen, à Neuchâtel, sont membres du conseil de fondation avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005566490, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fonds de secours et de prévoyance de l'entreprise Emile Egger & Cie S.A., à Cressier (NE), CHE-109.769.113 (FOSC du 24.12.2021, p. 0/1005367694). Jenzer Roland est maintenant domicilié à Surpierre.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.