Reports for Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo
- Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo has its legal headquarters in Poschiavo and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of libraries and museums».
- The organization was founded on 13.05.1972.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.11.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo is registered under the UID CHE-113.167.012.
Management (19)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Adriano Menghini,
Moreno Raselli,
Emanuele Bontognali,
Elvezio Lardi-Rossi,
Daniele Papacella
newest authorized signatories
Adriano Menghini,
Moreno Raselli,
Emanuele Bontognali,
Giovanni Ruatti,
Elvezio Lardi-Rossi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.05.1972
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Poschiavo
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.102-1
UID/VAT
CHE-113.167.012
Sector
Operation of libraries and museums
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conservare, amministrare ed ampliare il suo patrimonio onde documentare e rendere accessibile al pubblico storia, cultura e arte della Valle di Poschiavo.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Bernina AG | Poschiavo | 12.09.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lardi & Partners SA | Lugano | 26.11.2014 | 11.09.2018 | |
Cortesi Costa & Associati SA | Poschiavo | 23.07.2010 | 25.11.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondazione Ente Museo Poschiavino
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005613135, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Fondazione Ente Museo Poschiavino, in Poschiavo, CHE-113.167.012, fondazione (Nr. FUSC 180 del 16.09.2021, Pubbl. 1005292700).
Atto pubblico modificato:
29.09.2022.
Nuovo nome:
Fondazione Musei Valposchiavo.
Nuovo recapito:
Via da Spultri 2, 7742 Poschiavo.
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Raselli, Paolo, da Poschiavo, in Le Prese (Poschiavo), presidente, con firma collettiva a due;
Ferrari-Zanetti, Loreta, da Poschiavo, in Poschiavo, membro, con firma collettiva a due;
Passini, Nicola, da Poschiavo, in Poschiavo, membro, con firma collettiva a due.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Raselli, Moreno, da Poschiavo, in Poschiavo, presidente, con firma collettiva a due [finora: vice-presidente, con firma collettiva a due];
Menghini, Adriano, da Poschiavo, in Poschiavo, vice-presidente, con firma collettiva a due [finora: membro, senza diritto di firma];
Bontognali, Emanuele, da Poschiavo, in Poschiavo, membro, con firma collettiva a due;
Ruatti, Giovanni, cittadino italiano, in Poschiavo, direttore, con firma collettiva a due.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.