Address
c/o Jean Philippoz
Rue de la Vidondé 25
1912 Leytron
Reports for Fondation St-Martin Leytron
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation St-Martin Leytron
- Fondation St-Martin Leytron is active in the industry «Other social services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Leytron.
- The management consists of 7 persons. The organization was founded on 06.05.2010.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 25.03.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization's UID is CHE-115.662.989.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Joseph Ramuz,
Claude Gérard Philippoz,
Cécile Philippoz,
Jean Bernard Philippoz,
Claudine Michellod
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.05.2010
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Leytron
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.7.006.745-1
UID/VAT
CHE-115.662.989
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Favoriser, par tous les moyens possibles, le bien-être et le cadre de vie des personnes âgées domiciliées sur la commune de Leytron, toute revendication individuelle étant proscrite, l'action de la fondation se limitant à la recherche de solutions propres à favoriser l'ensemble des personnes âgées domiciliées à Leytron.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CEFIMA SA - Fiduciaire de Leytron | Leytron | 25.03.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | 12.05.2010 | 24.03.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation St-Martin Leytron
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005436056, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation St-Martin Leytron, à Leytron, CHE-115.662.989, fondation (No. FOSC 25 du 06.02.2012, Publ. 6536232).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Jean Philippoz, Rue de la Vidondé 25, 1912 Leytron.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Martinet, Patrice, de Leytron, à Leytron, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
NOFIVAL SA, à Martigny (CH-621.3.002.011-3), organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ramuz, Joseph, de Leytron, à Leytron, vice-président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Philippoz, Cécile, de Leytron, à Leytron, membre et secrétaire du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire et membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Philippoz, Claude, de Leytron, à Leytron, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
CEFIMA SA - Fiduciaire de Leytron (CHE-106.993.329), à Leytron, organe de révision.
Publication number: 6536232, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation St-Martin Leytron, à Leytron, CH-621.7.006.745-1, fondation (No. FOSC 115 du 17.06.2010, p. 25, Publ. 5681132).
Organisation:
[mention de l'organisation biffée d'office suite à la modification de l'ORC entrée en vigueur 01.01.2012].
Publication number: 5681132, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation St-Martin Leytron, à Leytron, CH-621.7.006.745-1, fondation (FOSC no 91 du 12.05.2010, p. 18, publ. 5629762).
Autorité de surveillance:
Préfet du district de Martigny, à Martigny.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.