Address
c/o Sodalitas SCI
rue Joseph-Piller 6
1700 Fribourg
Reports for Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur
- Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur from Fribourg operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 26.02.1955.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 01.07.2013. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-110.291.868.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.1955
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.170.047-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.291.868
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Promouvoir et soutenir des oeuvres d'utilité publique dans le canton de Fribourg.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Wassmer S.A. | Fribourg | 26.08.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation St-Jacques
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 947885, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur, à Fribourg, CH-217-0170047-5 (FOSC du 29.11.2012, p. 0/6951950). Brunisholz Ferdinand n'est plus membre du conseil de fondation;
sa signature est radiée. Barras Clément qui se nomme précisement Barras Clément Yves, est nommé président, avec signature collective à deux, et Aebischer Marcel, de Schmitten FR, à Fribourg, est nommé membre du conseil, sans signature.
Publication number: 6951950, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur, à Fribourg, CH-217-0170047-5, promouvoir et soutenir des oeuvres d'utilité publique dans le canton de Fribourg. (FOSC du 26.08.2009, p. 8/5215648).
Nouvelle dénomination de l'Autorité de surveillance:
Service de la justice.
Publication number: 5215648, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation St-Jacques Le Majeur, à Fribourg, CH-217-0170047-5, promouvoir et soutenir des oeuvres d'utilité publique dans le canton de Fribourg. (FOSC du 21.11.2007, p. 4).
Organe de révision:
Fiduciaire Wassmer S.A. (CH-217-0132140-4), à Fribourg.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.