Address
c/o Ligue genevoise contre le cancer
Rue Leschot 11
1205 Genève
Reports for Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer
- Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Research and development».
- The management of the organization Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer, which was founded on the 30.04.1988, consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 04.11.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization's UID is CHE-101.850.421.
- On the same address as Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Association Histoire de Lire, LIGUE GENEVOISE CONTRE LE CANCER, Schubert.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1988
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.335.988-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.850.421
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Contribuer à la recherche contre le cancer par la distribution de ses revenus à la Ligue Genevoise contre le Cancer ou à défaut, aux Hôpitaux Universitaires de Genève, section d'oncologie.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Société fiduciaire d'Expertise et de Revision SA | Genève | 04.11.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pierre Richa & Partners SA, Société Fiduciaire | Genève | 04.09.2014 | 03.11.2022 | |
Experaudit SA | Genève | 17.01.2007 | 03.09.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation Octave et Georgette Pelligot contre le cancer
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005597711, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer, à Genève, CHE-101.850.421 (FOSC du 13.11.2018, p. 0/1004496998). Pierre Richa & Partners SA, Société Fiduciaire (CHE-106.536.191) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Société fiduciaire d'Expertise et de Revision SA (CHE-107.745.082), à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1004496998, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer, à Genève, CHE-101.850.421 (FOSC du 04.09.2014, p. 0/1697931). Chapuis Bernard n'est plus membre du conseil;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Conne Pierre, de Chexbres, à Genève, est membre du conseil avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 1697931, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation Octave et Georgette PELLIGOT contre le cancer, à Genève, CHE-101.850.421 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225832). L'inscription n° 12476 du 19.07.2013 (FOSC du 24-07-2013, p. 0/994297) est rectifiée en ce sens que Kössler Romain est domicilié à Genève, et non pas à Anières. Bernasconi Vincent, nommé secrétaire, et Chapuis Bernard, jusqu'ici secrétaire, continuent à signer collectivement à deux. Experaudit SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Pierre Richa & Partners SA, Société Fiduciaire (CHE-106.536.191), à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.