Address
c/o Jean-Pierre Dervey
1699 Pont (Veveyse)
Reports for Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse)
- Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse) is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Pont (Veveyse).
- The management consists of 6 persons. The organization was founded on 12.08.2003.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 10.07.2013.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-110.178.864.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Nicolas Antoine Favre,
André Monney,
Pierre Pichonnaz,
Jean-Pierre Dervey,
Christian Bernard Ducrest
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Antoine Favre,
André Monney,
Pierre Pichonnaz,
Jean-Pierre Dervey,
Christian Bernard Ducrest
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.2003
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Flon
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.1.002.421-2
UID/VAT
CHE-110.178.864
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Aider et encourager les jeunes de la commune de Pont (Veveyse) à apprendre des arts ou des métiers. Cette forme d'aide ayant été actualisée, elle récompense tout apprenti au bénéfice d'un certificat fédéral de capacité (CFC) ainsi que tout étudiant ayant obtenu un diplôme équivalent; bourgeois de la commune de Pont (veveyse). Par l'octroi d'une bourse au terme d'une période de formation, la fondation entend les encourager à approfondir leurs connaissances dans la profession apprise. Eu égard aux éventuelles fusions de communes à venir, il est précisé que la zone d'activité de la présente fondation est limitée exclusivement au territoire actuel de la commune de Pont (Veveyse) et ne sera en aucun cas étendue aux territoires d'autres communes.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 969119, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse), à Le Flon, CH-217-1002421-2 (FOSC du 26.11.2012, p. 0/6947320). Favre Jules n'est plus membre;
sa signature est radiée. Favre Nicolas Antoine, de et à Le Flon, est nommé membre du conseil et trésorier, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 6947320, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse), à Le Flon, CH-217-1002421-2, aider et encourager les jeunes de la commune de Pont (Veveyse) à apprendre des arts ou des métiers, etc. (FOSC du 12.08.2010, p. 5/5768352).
Nouvelle dénomination de l'Autorité de surveillance:
Service de la justice.
Publication number: 5768352, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Joseph FAVRE de Pont (Veveyse), à Le Flon, CH-217-1002421-2, aider et encourager les jeunes de la commune de Pont (Veveyse) à apprendre des arts ou des métiers, etc. (FOSC du 14.04.2004, p. 7). Statuts modifiés le 30.11.2009. Selon dispense octroyée par l'autorité de surveillance du 19.05.2010, la fondation n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.