Address
Rue Daniel-Jeanrichard 35
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds
Reports for Fondation Fuyo Dokai
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Fuyo Dokai
- Fondation Fuyo Dokai is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in La Chaux-de-Fonds.
- The organization was founded on 09.09.1998.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 06.09.2024.
- The organization's UID is CHE-109.954.509.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Magali Yolande Holzhauer,
Dominique Siron,
Simone Wolf Lehmann Jiko
newest authorized signatories
Magali Yolande Holzhauer,
Dominique Siron,
Simone Wolf Lehmann Jiko
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
La Chaux-de-Fonds
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.1.006.845-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.954.509
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Favoriser et propager la pratique du Zen et le message universel de la religion bouddhiste par l'éducation et l'enseignement; la méditation; la diffusion de biens et produits, le soutien des activités de l'Association Dojo Zen; activités culturelles ou commerciales.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Fiduciaire Neuchâtel SA | Neuchâtel | 12.06.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agence Y. Lanoir & Cie SCM | Neuchâtel | 25.02.2016 | 11.06.2019 | |
Serratus SA en liquidation | Corcelles-Cormondrèche | 22.07.2009 | 24.02.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Fuyo Dokai
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006124288, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Fuyo Dokai, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-109.954.509 (FOSC du 12.06.2019, p. 0/1004649552). L'organe de révision "Fiduciaire Y. Lanoir & Cie SA" a modifié sa raison de commerce en "PKF Fiduciaire Neuchâtel SA" (CHE-390.646.287).
Publication number: HR02-1004649552, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Fuyo Dokai, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-109.954.509 (FOSC du 25.02.2016, p. 0/2689017). "Fiduciaire Y. Lanoir & Cie" (CHE-107.775.261) n'est plus organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
"Fiduciaire Y. Lanoir & Cie SA" (CHE-390.646.287), à Neuchâtel.
Publication number: 2689017, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Fuyo Dokai, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-109.954.509 (FOSC du 24.09.2014, p. 0/1731305). 'Serratus SA' (CH-645-1000077-9) n'est plus organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
'Fiduciaire Y. Lanoir & Cie' (CHE-107.775.261), à Neuchâtel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.