Address
c/o Fiduciaire Lambelet Société Anonyme Fidal
Avenue Louis-Ruchonnet 15
1003 Lausanne
Reports for Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne
- Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne has 7 persons entered in its management.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 06.11.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-116.299.443.
- Next to the organization Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne there are 12 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ArProds Sàrl, Blondel Holding International SA, Blondel Trading International Sàrl.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Alain Mermoud,
Marianne Schmid Mast,
Henri Enguerran Gauthier Badoux,
Jean-Yves Bieri,
Christophe Fischer
newest authorized signatories
Alain Mermoud,
Henri Enguerran Gauthier Badoux,
Jean-Yves Bieri,
Christophe Fischer,
Philippe Widmer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.12.2010
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.079.007-9
UID/VAT
CHE-116.299.443
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fondation a pour but de soutenir la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne notamment en lui fournissant des ressources financières pour financer des projets spécifiques.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Fidyver SA | Montagny-près-Yverdon | 09.12.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005877728, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne, à Lausanne, CHE-116.299.443 (FOSC du 06.02.2018, p. 0/4039213). Hort Vincent, Zumwald Pierre, Baehni Luc-Antoine, dont la signature est radiée, et Bonardi Jean-Philippe, inscrit sans signature, ne sont plus membres du conseil de fondation. Mermoud Alain, de Montilliez, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), président, avec signature collective à deux, Badoux Henri Enguerran Gauthier, de Aigle, à Londres (Royaume-Uni), avec signature collective à deux, Bieri Jean-Yves, de Langnau im Emmental, à Chigny, avec signature collective à deux, et Schmid Mast Marianne, de Lengwil, à Pully, sans signature, sont membres du conseil de fondation.
Publication number: 4039213, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne, à Lausanne, CHE-116.299.443 (FOSC du 27.10.2016, p. 0/3131265).
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue Louis-Ruchonnet 15, c/o Fiduciaire Lambelet Société Anonyme Fidal, 1003 Lausanne.
Publication number: 3131265, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fondation en faveur de la Faculté des Hautes Etudes Commerciales de l'Université de Lausanne, à Lausanne, CHE-116.299.443 (FOSC du 25.07.2014, p. 0/1634925). Fleury Perry, dont la signature est radiée, et Von Ungern-Sternberg Thomas, inscrit sans signature, ne sont plus membres du conseil de fondation.
Nouveaux membres du conseil de fondation:
Fischer Christophe, de Meisterschwanden, à La Tour-de-Peilz, trésorier, avec signature collective à deux, et Bonardi Jean-Philippe, de France, à Lutry, sans signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.