Reports for Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR)
- Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR) is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Mézières FR.
- The organization was founded on 07.11.1994.
- The last commercial register change was made on 19.07.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.396.438.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Sandra Geneviève Robatel,
Alexandre Francis Dumas,
Olivier Guyot,
Charles-Henri Lang,
Willy Pascal Schorderet
newest authorized signatories
Sandra Geneviève Robatel,
Alexandre Francis Dumas,
Olivier Guyot,
Charles-Henri Lang,
Willy Pascal Schorderet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.11.1994
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Mézières (FR)
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.370.034-8
UID/VAT
CHE-110.396.438
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Étudier et réaliser les travaux de sauvegarde, de restauration, de conservation et de mise en valeur du Château de Mézières.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Butty SA | Ursy | 18.04.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation Moret Edith - Château de Mézières FR
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005799021, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR), à Mézières (FR), CHE-110.396.438 (FOSC du 19.03.2021, p. 0/1005128382).
Personnes radiées:
Dévaud-Jacquet Stéphanie, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Dumas Raphaël, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Morel-Jordi Monique Rose, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Robatel Sandra Geneviève, de et à Torny, membre du conseil de fondation, secrétaire, signature collective à deux;
Dumas Alexandre Francis, de Mézières FR, à Le Châtelard, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005128382, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR), à Mézières (FR), CHE-110.396.438 (FOSC du 09.12.2019, p. 0/1004778083).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Fiduciaire Gilbert Butty SA (CH-217-0330263-5), organe de révision, nouvelle raison sociale Fiduciaire Butty SA (CHE-107.770.996).
Publication number: HR02-1004778083, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Edith Moret - Château de Mézières (FR), à Mézières (FR), CHE-110.396.438 (FOSC du 07.06.2018, p. 0/4275319).
Personnes radiées:
Droux-Equey Marie-José Germaine, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Jacqué Bernard, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Dévaud-Jacquet Stéphanie, de Le Flon, à Mézières FR, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Guyot Olivier, de Rochefort, à Chénens, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.