Reports for Fondation de l'Observatoire
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation de l'Observatoire
- Fondation de l'Observatoire in Vérossaz is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Fondation de l'Observatoire is active.
- Fondation de l'Observatoire has 6 persons entered in its management.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.01.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-112.553.507.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Gabrielle Rey,
Patrick Barman,
Jean-Didier Roch,
Pierre-André D'Andrès,
David Lindemann
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.10.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Vérossaz
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.7.002.505-1
UID/VAT
CHE-112.553.507
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Implanter et développer au lieu-dit "Mabilien", sur le territoire de la commune de Vérossaz, un observatoire astronomique; promouvoir dans le public, en particulier dans de la jeunesse, l'étude et la connaissance du ciel; acquérir, cas échéant, les immeubles nécessaires à la réalisation de ses buts
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation de l'Observatoire
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005656954, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation de l'Observatoire, à Vérossaz, CHE-112.553.507, fondation (No. FOSC 49 du 12.03.2019, Publ. 1004585976).
Adresse précisée:
Chemin de Mabilien, 1891 Vérossaz.
Autre adresse:
c/o Pierre-André D'Andrès, Case postale 217, 1890 St-Maurice [précédemment: Chemin du Levant 16, 1890 St-Maurice].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Imesch, Sébastian, de Brig-Glis, à Vérossaz, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président;
Robatel, Pierre Yves, de Prez-vers-Noréaz, à Saint-Maurice, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Barman, Patrick, de Saint-Maurice, à Saint-Maurice, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Rey, Gabrielle, de Vionnaz, à Vérossaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004585976, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation de l'Observatoire, à Vérossaz, CHE-112.553.507, fondation (No. FOSC 72 du 16.04.2018, Publ. 4173879).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
D'Andrès, Pierre-André, de Martigny, à Saint-Maurice, président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Roch, Jean Didier, de Collombey-Muraz, à Saint-Maurice, vice-président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Imesch, Sébastian, de Brig-Glis, à Vérossaz, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président [précédemment: président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux];
Robatel, Pierre Yves, de Prez-vers-Noréaz, à Saint-Maurice, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Lindemann, David, de Longirod, à Vérossaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature [précédemment: membre, sans droit de signature].
Publication number: 4173879, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation de l'Observatoire, à Vérossaz, CHE-112.553.507, fondation (No. FOSC 96 du 21.05.2015, Publ. 2163669).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Jacquemoud née Morisod, Fridoline, de Vérossaz, à Vérossaz, caissière, secrétaire, sans droit de signature;
Délétroz, Bernard, de Ayent, à Saint-Maurice, président, avec signature collective à deux avec Pierre-Yves Robatel;
Fellay, Frédéric, de Bagnes, à Vérossaz, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux avec Pierre-Yves Robatel.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Imesch, Sébastian, de Brig-Glis, à Vérossaz, président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Robatel, Pierre Yves, de Prez-vers-Noréaz, à Saint-Maurice, membre, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.