Reports for Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses"
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses"
- Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses" has its legal headquarters in Anières, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled».
- The management consists of 8 persons. The organization was founded on 13.02.1988.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 10.05.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses" is registered under the UID CHE-106.246.824.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Florian Gross,
Pascal Rodolphe Wassmer,
Yola Biedermann Panaghiota,
Béatrice Grandjean-Kyburz,
Olivier Dechevrens
newest authorized signatories
Florian Gross,
Christophe Peccoud,
Olivier Dechevrens,
Emmanuelle Gentizon Salgues
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.02.1988
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Anières
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.101.988-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.246.824
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestion d'un ou plusieurs foyers de jour pour personnes âgées; gestion d'appartements destinés aux personnes âgées.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Fiduciaire SA | Genève | 10.07.2020 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidesma Audit Sàrl | Genève | 05.06.2015 | 09.07.2020 | |
AUREFI SOCIETE FIDUCIAIRE SA | Genève | 28.04.2010 | 04.06.2015 | |
BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA | Genève | 14.03.2008 | 27.04.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation 'Aux Cinq Colosses'
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses"
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006029601, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses", à Anières, CHE-106.246.824 (FOSC du 23.05.2022, p. 0/1005480365). Servettaz Roger n'est plus membre du conseil;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Gross Florian jusqu'ici membre vice-président est désormais membre président.
Publication number: HR02-1005480365, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses", à Anières, CHE-106.246.824 (FOSC du 10.07.2020, p. 0/1004934781). Biedermann Panaghiota Yola est maintenant domiciliée à Jussy et Grandjean-Kyburz Béatrice à Corsier GE. Gentizon Salgues Emmanuelle est maintenant originaire de Vully-les-Lacs et domiciliée à Thonon-les-Bains, FRA. Peccoud Christophe, nommé directeur adjoint, continue à signer collectivement à deux. Wassmer Pascal, de Corsier GE, à Anières, est membre du conseil, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004934781, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation "Aux Cinq Colosses", à Anières, CHE-106.246.824 (FOSC du 01.05.2017, p. 0/3496105). Chrétien Danielle n'est plus membre du conseil (décédée);
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Fidesma Audit Sàrl (CHE-285.703.335) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
PKF Fiduciaire SA (CHE-103.327.449), à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.