Address
c/o Jacques Perroud
Route Nez d'Avau 2
1690 Lussy FR
Reports for Fondation Auguste Jordan
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Auguste Jordan
- Fondation Auguste Jordan has its legal headquarters in Lussy FR and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Other social services».
- The management has 8 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.06.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Fondation Auguste Jordan is the following: CHE-102.019.577.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christophe Rhême,
Jacques Perroud,
Apetogbo Komlan Agbeti,
Eric Crausaz,
Yann Christophe Bussard
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.06.1959
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Villaz
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.370.003-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.019.577
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Venir en aide aux personnes âgées dans le besoin, et aux jeunes désirant poursuivre des études ou acquérir une formation professionnelle. Les bénéficiaires sont en principe, domiciliés à Lussy ou originaire de cette commune.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDUVISION SA | Gibloux | 23.03.2020 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Peiry Paul | Fribourg | 08.10.2015 | 22.03.2020 | |
Fiduciaire Philippe Boyer | Romont (FR) | 05.06.2015 | 07.10.2015 | |
Fiduciaire Marc Gobet SA | Romont (FR) | 04.03.2010 | 02.12.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Auguste Jordan
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005765043, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Auguste Jordan, à Villaz, CHE-102.019.577 (FOSC du 25.05.2023, p. 0/1005753713).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route Nez d'Avau 2, c/o Jacques Perroud, 1690 Lussy FR.
Publication number: HR02-1005753713, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Auguste Jordan, à Villaz, CHE-102.019.577 (FOSC du 23.03.2020, p. 0/1004858122).
Personnes radiées:
Rhême Georges, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Crausaz Michel, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Python Martial André, membre de conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Sallin Christian, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Perroud Jacques, membre du conseil de fondation, vice-président, signature collective à deux, maintenant membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux, désormais à Villaz (fusion de commune);
Jordan Bernard Edmond, membre du conseil de fondation, secrétaire, caissier, signature collective à deux, désormais de Villaz (fusion de commune), à Romont FR.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Rhême Christophe, de et à Villaz, membre du conseil de fondation, vice-président, signature collective à deux;
Agbeti Apetogbo Komlan, du Togo, à Villaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Bussard Yann Christophe, de Gruyères, à Villaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Crausaz Eric, de et à Villaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004858122, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Auguste Jordan, à Villaz, CHE-102.019.577 (FOSC du 09.01.2020, p. 0/1004800000).
Personne radiée:
Peiry Paul (CHE-114.949.968), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
FIDUVISION SA (CHE-108.733.791), à Gibloux., organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.