Reports for Fondation André Guex-Joris
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation André Guex-Joris
- Fondation André Guex-Joris is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Martigny.
- The organization was founded on 15.05.1995.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.09.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-110.397.863.
- On the same address as Fondation André Guex-Joris there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Francine Mathey, She's Sàrl.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Pierre-André Perrin,
Raphy Darbellay,
Bruno Thurre,
Daniel Constantin,
Patrice Moret
newest authorized signatories
Pierre-André Perrin,
Raphy Darbellay,
Michaël Hugon,
Edmond Voeffray
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.05.1995
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Martigny
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.7.002.299-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.397.863
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La conservation et la mise en valeur des archives musicales d'André et Elisabeth Guex-Joris, à Morges; à cet effet, la fondation pourra organiser des expositions et des manifestations culturelles en rapport direct ou indirect avec cette collection, mettre sur pied des activités musicales ou culturelles, accueillir à titre temporaire ou permanent d'autres collections d'archives musicales, remettre en prêt certaines pièces de la collection
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Bender SA | Martigny | 23.09.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bender Immo SA | Martigny | 05.09.2018 | 22.09.2024 | |
Fiduciaire Maillard SA | Pully | 09.12.2011 | 04.09.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation Guex-Joris André
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation André Guex-Joris
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006135977, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation André Guex-Joris, à Martigny, CHE-110.397.863, fondation (No. FOSC 171 du 05.09.2018, Publ. 4449742).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire Bender SA (CHE-105.760.567), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduciaire Bender SA (CHE-495.179.342), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-0004449742, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation André Guex-Joris, à Martigny, CHE-110.397.863, fondation (No. FOSC 74 du 16.04.2014, Publ. 1457855).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Goy, Pierre, de Vaulion, à Clarens (Montreux), président du conseil et du bureau, avec signature collective à deux;
Genoud, Jean Claude, de Châtel-Saint-Denis, à Granges-Paccot, membre, sans droit de signature;
Gianadda, François, de Salvan et Martigny, à Martigny, membre, sans droit de signature;
Smets, Romain, citoyen français, à Botyre (Ayent), membre, sans droit de signature;
Fiduciaire Maillard SA (CH-550.0.109.340-0), à Lausanne, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Darbellay, Raphy, de Liddes et Martigny, à Martigny, président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Hugon, Michaël, de Martigny et Finhaut, à Martigny, vice-président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire [précédemment: vice-président du conseil et membre du bureau, avec signature collective à deux];
Perrin, Pierre-André, de Sierre, à Dorénaz, membre et secrétaire du conseil de fondation, caissier, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre du conseil et du bureau, trésorier, sans droit de signature];
Constantin , Daniel, de Arbaz, à Arbaz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Moret, Patrice, de Martigny, à Charrat, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Moulin-Michellod, Sandra, de Bagnes, à Martigny, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Thurre, Bruno, de Saillon, à Martigny, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Fiduciaire Bender SA (CHE-105.760.567), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Publication number: 1457855, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation André Guex-Joris, à Martigny, CHE-110.397.863, fondation (No. FOSC 25 du 06.02.2012, Publ. 6537314).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Vauterin, Raymond, citoyen belge, à Vevey, trésorier, sans droit de signature;
Goy, Jacques-Armand, de Vaulion, à Lausanne, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Perrin, Pierre-André, de Sierre, à Dorénaz, membre du conseil et du bureau et trésorier, sans droit de signature [précédemment: membre du conseil et du bureau sans droit de signature];
Corsi, Paolo, citoyen italien, à Annemasse (FR), membre, sans droit de signature;
Genoud, Jean Claude, de Châtel-Saint-Denis, à Granges-Paccot, membre, sans droit de signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.