Address
c/o Bourgeoisie de Sion, Hôtel-de-Ville
Rue du Grand-Pont
1950 Sion
Reports for Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy
- Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy has its legal headquarters in Sion and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Other social services».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 21.06.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-112.401.346.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Victor Fournier,
Christophe Maret,
Antoine du Fay de Lavallaz
newest authorized signatories
Victor Fournier,
Christophe Maret,
Antoine du Fay de Lavallaz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.09.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.7.004.417-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.401.346
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Venir en aide à des personnes de Sion et de Bagnes, âgées, malades et en difficultés financières
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Sion | Sion | 23.10.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Botschafter Luy Dr Marcel
- Fondation Ambassadeur Luy Marcel
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005774561, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy, à Sion, CHE-112.401.346, fondation (No. FOSC 180 du 16.09.2021, Publ. 1005293006).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Tornare, Yann, de Marsens, à Fully, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fournier, Victor , de Martigny, à Grimisuat, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005293006, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy, à Sion, CHE-112.401.346, fondation (No. FOSC 85 du 03.05.2018, Publ. 4210637).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Rossier, Eloi, de Bagnes, à Bagnes, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Maret, Christophe, de Conthey, à Val de Bagnes, vice-président du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 4210637, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Ambassadeur Marcel Luy, à Sion, CHE-112.401.346, fondation (No. FOSC 81 du 29.04.2015, Publ. 2125365).
Nouvelle autorité de surveillance:
Département de la sécurité, des institutions et du sport (DSIS).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.