Address
c/o Institution Soeurs de Saint Maurice
Avenue de Vérolliez 52
1890 St-Maurice
Reports for Fondation Aina Vao
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Aina Vao
- Fondation Aina Vao has its legal headquarters in St-Maurice, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Fondation Aina Vao has 7 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 10.07.2024.
- The organization Fondation Aina Vao is registered under the UID CHE-160.658.468.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Etienne Barras,
Martial Gaston Coutaz,
Daniela Laura Ardizzoni,
Marie Claudine Bera,
Nathalie Roduit
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2016
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Maurice
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.7.006.834-8
UID/VAT
CHE-160.658.468
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Assumer la gestion et soutenir financièrement le projet Aina Vao, développé à son origine par la Congrégation des Soeurs de Saint Maurice, dont les activités se déploient à Mahajanga/Madagascar; ce projet se déploie autour de trois piliers qui peuvent être développés ou modifiés, soit les activités de soin à l'intérieur du dispensaire, les prestations de santé communautaire développées dans les quartiers de la ville et les actions de santé scolaire; à cette fin, la fondation pourra récolter tous dons, contributions publiques et autres subventions et aides pour permettre la pérennisation du projet.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | 28.11.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Aina Vao
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006081098, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Aina Vao, à Saint-Maurice, CHE-160.658.468, fondation (No. FOSC 43 du 04.03.2019, Publ. 1004579721).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Giroud, Jean-Claude, citoyen français, à Saint Nazaine-Les Eymes (FR), membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Barras, Etienne, de Crans-Montana, à Sion, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Coutaz, Martial, de Saint-Maurice, à Saint-Maurice, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004579721, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Aina Vao, à Saint-Maurice, CHE-160.658.468, fondation (No. FOSC 35 du 20.02.2017, p.0, Publ. 3358915).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Barras, Adrienne, dite Soeur Adrienne, de Chermignon, à Bex, membre, avec signature individuelle;
Beatrefina, Lydie, dite Soeur Lydie, citoyenne malgache, à Mahajanga (MG), membre, sans droit de signature;
Lütolf, Berta, dite Soeur Berta, de Schötz, à Bex, avec procuration individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Roduit, Nathalie, de Fully, à Crans-Montana, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec Daniela Ardizzoni dite Soeur Daniela;
Ardizzoni, Daniela, dite Soeur Daniela, de Bex, à Bex, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature individuelle;
Bera, Marie Claudine, dite Soeur Claudine, citoyenne malgache, à Mahajanga (MG), membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: 3358915, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Aina Vao, à Saint-Maurice, CHE-160.658.468, fondation (No. FOSC 231 du 28.11.2016, Publ. 3188005).
Autorité de surveillance:
Département fédéral de l'Intérieur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.