Address
c/o Emmanuelle Kaelin
Chemin de Piamont 25a
1635 La Tour-de-Trême
Reports for fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère)
- fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère) with its legal headquarters in La Tour-de-Trême is active. fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère) operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management of the organization fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère) consists of 13 persons.
- On the 08.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-112.175.032.
Management (13)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Emmanuelle Kaelin Murith,
Baptiste Nein,
Georgette Ida Bussard,
Anne Marie Suzanne Carrel Meyer,
Monique Elise Oggier Huguenin
newest authorized signatories
Emmanuelle Kaelin Murith,
Anne Marie Suzanne Carrel Meyer,
Frédéric René Cotting,
Raymond Beaudelet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.01.2005
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.532.439-6
UID/VAT
CHE-112.175.032
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Venir en aide: aux familles et personnes dans le besoin, confrontées à des problèmes de santé, de handicap, de difficultés financières, etc., aux personnes nécessiteuses rencontrant des difficultés liées à l'âge, aux jeunes et aux enfants dans la précarité traversant des périodes critiques, nécessitant appui, traitement, encadrement, formation, repas pris hors domicile, etc. La fondation vient en aide subsidiairement aux aides étatiques et officielles ou aux couvertures d'assurances. Les bénéficiaires doivent être domiciliés dans le district de la Gruyère. La fondation ne poursuit aucun but lucratif, elle est apolitique et non confessionnelle.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. | Bulle | 28.01.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire de La Tour SA | Val-d'Illiez | 05.03.2018 | 27.01.2022 | |
Fiduciaire Cuennet Sàrl | Bulle | 11.06.2012 | 04.03.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- fondation afag Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère
- Fondation pour l'aide aux familles et personnes dans le besoin du district de la Gruyère
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006003113, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère), à Bulle, CHE-112.175.032 (FOSC du 21.04.2023, p. 0/1005729296).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de Piamont 25a, c/o Emmanuelle Kaelin, 1635 La Tour-de-Trême.
Personnes radiées:
Charrière Eugène Edouard, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Wyncoll Adéla, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Kaelin Emmanuelle, de Gruyères, à Bulle, membre du conseil de fondation, présidente, signature collective à deux;
Nein Baptiste, de Romont FR, à Bulle, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005729296, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère), à Bulle, CHE-112.175.032 (FOSC du 28.01.2022, p. 0/1005392116).
Personne radiée:
Gremaud Suzanne, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Bussard Georgette Ida, de Gruyères, à Vaulruz, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005392116, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
fondation afag (Fondation pour l'aide aux familles de la Gruyère), à Bulle, CHE-112.175.032 (FOSC du 26.11.2021, p. 0/1005343351).
Personne radiée:
Fiduciaire de La Tour SA (CHE-143.224.011), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. (CHE-100.387.254), à Bulle, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.