Reports for Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar
- Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sarnen.
- Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar was founded on 26.08.2002.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 17.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.995.796.
- Camenzind Human Resources GmbH, Kiosk am Dorfplatz, Michel, Plüss Bio Markt GmbH have the same address as Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar.
Management (4)
newest members of the committee
Stefan Gregor Vogler,
Jeremias Pellaton,
Rolf Fischer,
Rolf Stefan Grossenbacher
newest authorized signatories
Stefan Gregor Vogler,
Jeremias Pellaton,
Rolf Fischer,
Rolf Stefan Grossenbacher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.08.2002
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.6.002.470-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.995.796
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein ist eine wohltätige und politisch wie religiös neutrale Organisation und bezweckt: , - den Betrieb des 'Center for Vocational Training' (CVT) in Yangon sicher zu stellen; , - die berufliche Ausbildung in Myanmar im Allgemeinen zu fördern; , - spezielle Projekte, die diesem Zweck entsprechen, zu unterstützen und dafür finanzielle Mittel zu sammeln.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Verein für Berufsbildung
- Verein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar CVT
- Verein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006034308, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar, in Sarnen, CHE-109.995.796, Verein (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 16.03.2020, Publ. 1004853082).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Portmann, Heinrich Josef genannt Heini, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Sarnen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ebener, Ricco, von Kippel, in Freienstein (Freienstein-Teufen), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vogler, Stefan, von Lungern, in Gisikon, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Pellaton, Jeremias, von Val-de-Travers, in Steg im Tösstal (Fischenthal), Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004853082, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar, in Sarnen, CHE-109.995.796, Verein (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2016, Publ. 2950065).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knobel, Patrick, von Altendorf, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Spichtig, Reto, von Sachseln, in Sachseln, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogler, Stefan, von Lungern, in Kerns, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kiser, Dr. Karl, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Jurisch, Dr. Ann-Veruschka, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Konstanz (DE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischer, Rolf, von Stetten (AG), in Mägenwil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grossenbacher, Rolf, von Affoltern im Emmental, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2950065, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Förderverein für Berufsbildung in Myanmar, in Sarnen, CHE-109.995.796, Verein (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2014, Publ. 1767059).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kathriner, Cornelia, von Luzern und Sarnen, in Sarnen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Primoschitz, Axel, von Reichenburg, in Alpnach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.