Reports for FLYER AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FLYER AG
- FLYER AG is active in the industry «Manufacturing of other vehicles» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Huttwil.
- The management of the company FLYER AG, which was founded on the 06.12.2001, consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.11.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.415.520.
- company FLYER AG has 15 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Monika Vasconcelles,
Marco Furter,
Egbert Karl Hageböck,
Georg Clemens Honkomp,
Andreas Conrad Kessler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.12.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Huttwil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.015.540-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.415.520
Sector
Manufacturing of other vehicles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, die Produktion und den Vertrieb von effizienten Nahverkehrsmitteln und deren Komponenten sowie anderen Produkten aus dem Verkehr- und Energiebereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG Bern | Bern | 09.01.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 16.07.2014 | 08.01.2018 | |
Gfeller + Partner AG | Bern | <2004 | 15.07.2014 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
11.02.2019 | active | 82045/2018 | |
UPSTREET | 27.03.2018 | active | 63704/2017 |
Newest SOGC notifications: FLYER AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005882910, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FLYER AG, in Huttwil, CHE-109.415.520, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2023, Publ. 1005873721).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Christian, von Murgenthal, in Blumenstein, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005873721, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FLYER AG, in Huttwil, CHE-109.415.520, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2020, Publ. 1004907968).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stalder, Ralph, von Sarmenstorf, in Cham, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vasconcelles, Monika, von Zug, in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004907968, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FLYER AG, in Huttwil, CHE-109.415.520, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 11.12.2018, Publ. 1004517274).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Durdevic, Ivica Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Huttwil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stalder, Ralph, von Sarmenstorf, in Cham, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Langnau am Albis].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.