Reports for Flück Basel AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Flück Basel AG
- Flück Basel AG with its legal headquarters in Basel is active. Flück Basel AG operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The company was founded on 25.11.2015.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 06.10.2023.
- In the commercial register the company Flück Basel AG is registered under the UID CHE-252.789.146.
- On the same address there are 12 other active companies registered. These include: Contex Systems AG, Contex Treuhand AG, Contex Verwaltungs AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Truls Henrik Toggenburger,
Hans Bernhard Flück,
Harald Flückiger
newest authorized signatories
Truls Henrik Toggenburger,
Hans Bernhard Flück,
Harald Flückiger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.11.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.015.276-0
UID/VAT
CHE-252.789.146
CHE-451.391.658 VAT
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Kranarbeiten aller Art sowie Logistik und Dienstleistung am Bau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eugster Treuhand AG | Dübendorf | 30.11.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Flück Basel AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005854616, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Flück Basel AG, in Basel, CHE-252.789.146, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 30.11.2015, S.0, Publ. 2508885).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brendolise, Nina Yolanda, von Zürich, in Benglen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Toggenburger, Truls Henrik, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Flück, Hans Bernhard, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Flückiger, Harald, von Wynigen, in Zuzwil (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2508885, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Flück Basel AG, in Basel, CHE-252.789.146, Voltastr. 106, 4056 Basel, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.11.2015.
Zweck:
Ausführung von Kranarbeiten aller Art sowie Logistik und Dienstleistung am Bau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich an die letztbekannte Adresse.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Flück, Hans Bernhard, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Brendolise, Nina Yolanda, von Zürich, in Benglen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Eugster Treuhand AG (CHE-107.161.395), in Dübendorf, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.