Address
c/o Diocèse de Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg
Rue de Lausanne 86
1700 Fribourg
Reports for Flos Carmeli
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Flos Carmeli
- Flos Carmeli in Fribourg is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Flos Carmeli is active.
- The organization was founded on 08.02.2021 and has 3 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 09.06.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Flos Carmeli is the following: CHE-278.662.317.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: Coussicou SA, Fondation Des Ailes Pour Ta Vie, Fondation fribourgeoise pour la conservation de la maison d'habitation de S. Nicolas de Flüe, à Flüeli.
Management (3)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Nicolas Auguste Marie Glasson,
Fabrice Dimitri Hadjadj,
Jean-Baptiste Marie Samuel Henry de Diesbach
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Auguste Marie Glasson,
Fabrice Dimitri Hadjadj,
Jean-Baptiste Marie Samuel Henry de Diesbach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.02.2021
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.575.508-9
UID/VAT
CHE-278.662.317
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fondation a pour but d'aider et favoriser la vie érémitique à Cournillens, Ermitage St-Jean de la Croix en Suisse et subsidiairement aider les communautés des Frères Carmes en Suisse. La fondation n'a pas de but lucratif et ne vise aucun gain.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Flos Carmeli
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005491441, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Flos Carmeli, à Fribourg, CHE-278.662.317 (FOSC du 11.02.2021, p. 0/1005098078).
Personnes radiées:
von Roten Philippe, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Masson Nicolas Sébastien, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Niclasse Hubert Irénée, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Glasson Nicolas Auguste Marie, de Bulle, à Gruyères, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Hadjadj Fabrice Dimitri, de France, à Le Mouret, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Henry de Diesbach Jean-Baptiste Marie Samuel, de et à Fribourg, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR01-1005098078, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Flos Carmeli, à Fribourg, Rue de Lausanne 86, c/o Diocèse de Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg, 1700 Fribourg, CHE-278.662.317. Nouvelle fondation.
Acte constitutif et statuts du:
21.12.2012, modifiés le 26.10.2020.
But:
la fondation a pour but d'aider et favoriser la vie érémitique à Cournillens, Ermitage St-Jean de la Croix en Suisse et subsidiairement aider les communautés des Frères Carmes en Suisse. La fondation n'a pas de but lucratif et ne vise aucun gain. La fondation est exemptée de surveillance étatique en raison de sa qualité de fondation ecclésiastique et n'a par conséquent pas l'obligation de désigner un organe de révision. La surveillance est exercée par le Diocèse de Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg.
Personnes inscrites:
von Roten Philippe, de Sion, à Bex, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Masson Nicolas Sébastien, de Dardagny, à Fribourg, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux;
Niclasse Hubert Irénée, de Pont-en-Ogoz, à Fribourg, membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.