Reports for FlexDSL Telecommunications AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FlexDSL Telecommunications AG
- FlexDSL Telecommunications AG is currently active and the industry «Manufacturing of electronic components». The legal headquarters are in Urdorf.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 29.05.2001.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.03.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-109.058.130.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.05.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.012.264-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.058.130
Sector
Manufacturing of electronic components
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und Projektleitung im Bereich der Elektronik, das Engineering, Consulting und Management weiterer Gesellschaften sowie den Handel mit Elektronik-, Informatik- und Telekommunikationsprodukten und -teilen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu veräussern und zu verwalten. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 28.03.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Köniz | 21.12.2005 | 27.03.2023 | |
Honegger Treuhand AG | Freienbach | <2004 | 20.12.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
FLEXDSL | 10.01.2002 | deleted | 06979/2001 |
Newest SOGC notifications: FlexDSL Telecommunications AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005710424, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FlexDSL Telecommunications AG, in Urdorf, CHE-109.058.130, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 11.09.2012, S.0, Publ. 6843674).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG, in Muri bei Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ENGEL COPERA AG (CHE-103.132.443), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6843674, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FlexDSL Telecommunications AG, in Urdorf, CH-130.0.012.264-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 10.11.2009, S. 25, Publ. 5335692).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krähenbühl, Brigitte, von Zäziwil, in Dietikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Curcic, Milan, von Kloten, in Kloten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5335692, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FlexDSL Telecommunications AG, in Urdorf, CH-130.0.012.264-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2005, S. 26, Publ. 3159010).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Miroshnikov, Dmitry, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wettswil am Albis, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wenzel, Marco Thomas, von Neuhausen am Rheinfall, in Adlikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zuber, Christoph, von Urdorf und Günsberg, in Urdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Aschwanden, Rudolf, von Seelisberg, in Bassersdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.