Reports for Finteco AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Finteco AG
- Finteco AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Bassersdorf.
- Finteco AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- On the 05.08.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-100.798.930.
- Next to the company Finteco AG there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ba institute AG, Bega Beach AG, Cat Garden Hotel GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.01.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bassersdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.005.698-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.798.930
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Aktivitäten im In- und Ausland wie Industrieberatung und Planung, Industriemanagement und Vertretungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Verwaltungsbüro Margrit Künzler-Meier | Wangen-Brüttisellen | <2004 | 21.06.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Finteco Ltd
- Finteco SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Finteco AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005535414, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finteco AG, in Bassersdorf, CHE-100.798.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2020, Publ. 1005057180).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kläui, Beat, von Winterthur, in Bassersdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kostopoulos, Dimosthenis, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Russikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005057180, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finteco AG, in Bassersdorf, CHE-100.798.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2019, Publ. 1004544875).
Statutenänderung:
02.12.2020.
Aktien neu:
50 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 50 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004544875, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finteco AG, in Bassersdorf, CHE-100.798.930, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2015, Publ. 2231125).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spycher, Gabriela, von Köniz und Zürich, in Wangen-Brüttisellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kläui, Beat, von Winterthur, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.