Address
c/o Okey AG
In der Euelwies 8
8408 Winterthur
Reports for Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG
- Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG with its legal headquarters in Winterthur is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG is active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 29.04.1972.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 27.01.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-109.728.982.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dennis Viktor Laubbacher,
Dr. Christian Peter Katz,
Marcel Brühwiler
newest authorized signatories
Dennis Viktor Laubbacher,
Dr. Christian Peter Katz,
Marcel Brühwiler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.04.1972
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.902.932-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.728.982
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Finanzierung und Leistung von Beiträgen der Stifterfirma sowie mit dieser wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundenen Unternehmungen an steuerbefreite Personalvorsorgeeinrichtungen, denen sie sich angeschlossen oder die sie selbst errichtet haben. Der Anschluss einer verbundenen Unternehmung erfolgt aufgrund einer schriftlichen Anschlussvereinbarung, die der Aufichtsbehörde zur Kenntnis zu bringen ist.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 23.02.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung der Okey AG
- Stiftung der O Key AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005662867, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG, in Winterthur, CHE-109.728.982, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2022, Publ. 1005590975).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sigrist, Claudia, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005590975, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG, in Winterthur, CHE-109.728.982, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 28.01.2022, Publ. 1005391658).
Urkundenänderung:
16.08.2022.
Publication number: HR02-1005391658, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Finanzierungsstiftung der Okey AG, in Winterthur, CHE-109.728.982, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004609145).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brönnimann, Georg Hans, von Wald BE, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heinzelmann, Emil, von Wädenswil und Liestal, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brühwiler, Marcel, von Fischingen, in Sirnach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Katz, Christian, von Zürich, in Hünenberg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Laubbacher, Dennis, von Appenzell, in Weinfelden, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.