Reports for FIDURSA SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FIDURSA SA
- FIDURSA SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Territet. FIDURSA SA belongs to the industry «Services for banks and credit institutions» and is currently active.
- The management has one active person registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 20.10.2020.
- FIDURSA SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-161.294.067.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.02.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Montreux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.557.320-4
UID/VAT
CHE-161.294.067
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conseil en gestion et transmission de patrimoine tant pour une clientèle suisse qu'étrangère; conseils dans les domaines économique, juridique, financier et fiscal (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FIDURSA SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005003737, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
FIDURSA SA, à Düdingen, CHE-161.294.067 (FOSC du 10.02.2015, p. 0/1980369). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg par suite du transfert du siège à Montreux.
Publication number: HR02-1005004080, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FIDURSA SA, précédemment à Düdingen, CHE-161.294.067 (FOSC du 10.02.2015, p. 0/1980369). Siège transféré à Montreux.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue de Bon-Port 5, 1820 Territet. Statuts modifiés le 7 octobre 2020. Les 10 actions au porteur de CHF 10'000, formant l'entier du capital-actions, sont converties en 10 actions nominatives de CHF 10'000.
Communications aux actionnaires:
FOSC et tous moyens de transmission écrit (courrier écrit, télécopie, courrier électronique). Vallier Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Fayard Jean-Romain, de France, à Montreux.
Publication number: 1980369, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
FIDURSA SA, à Düdingen, Brugerastrasse 34, c/o Pierre Vallier, 3186 Düdingen, CHE-161.294.067. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 03.02.2015.
But:
conseil en gestion et transmission de patrimoine tant pour une clientèle suisse qu'étrangère;
conseils dans les domaines économique, juridique, financier et fiscal (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 10 actions de CHF 10'000, au porteur.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
FOSC et par n'importe quel moyen de transmission écrit.
Administration:
Vallier Pierre, de France, à Düdingen, est administrateur, avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 03.02.2015, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.