Address
avenue des Alpes 36
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz
Reports for Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl
- Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Fiduciary services». The legal headquarters are in La Tour-de-Peilz.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 30.03.2009. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-109.455.100.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.01.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
La Tour-de-Peilz
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.028.373-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.455.100
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Opérations liées à l'activité fiduciaire
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4948532, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CH-550-1028373-3, opérations liées à l'activité fiduciaire (FOSC du 29.09.2003, p. 14/1191448). Statuts modifiés le 17 mars 2009. Le capital social de CHF 20'000 est désormais divisé en 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000, dont l'associé-gérant Antoniadis Roger est seul titulaire.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration du gérant du 17 mars 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Publication number: 1191448, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl, à Montreux (FOSC du 13.02.2002, p. 15). Statuts modifiés le 16 septembre 2003. Siège transféré à La Tour-de-Peilz, avenue des Alpes 36.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fiduciaire Antoniadis Sàrl, à Montreux (FOSC du 30.01.2002, p. 1). Statuts modifiés le 4 février 2002. Alexandra Favre n'est plus associéE;
sa part de CHF 1'000 est cédée à l'associé- gérant Roger Antoniadis, dont la part est portée de CHF 19'000 à CHF 20'000.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.