Branches (1)
Reports for FidAlp SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FidAlp SA
- FidAlp SA is active in the industry «Fiduciary services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Aigle.
- FidAlp SA was founded on 22.07.2004.
- The last commercial register change was made on 02.02.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-111.789.875.
- Fidalp Audit & Consultancy SA, HANGCHA (SWITZERLAND) SA, I'm Energy SA are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.07.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aigle
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.040.664-4
UID/VAT
CHE-111.789.875
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un bureau fiduciaire, et toute activité y relative, notamment établissement et tenue de comptabilités, de rapports d'expertise, accomplissement de formalités fiscales ou de marketing; fourniture de conseils de gestion, comptables, financiers et fiscaux; représentation de sociétés ou de détenteurs de valeurs suisses ou étrangères; organisation et réorganisation de sociétés; audits et révisions.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Orgeco, Organisation et Gestion Commerciales SA | Carouge (GE) | 21.09.2016 | 16.09.2018 | |
OGH expertises comptables et fiscales SA | Genève | 22.09.2014 | 20.09.2016 | |
OZ société fiduciaire Sàrl | Lausanne | 14.01.2010 | 21.09.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
FIDALP | 12.06.2009 | active | 50547/2009 |
Newest SOGC notifications: FidAlp SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005089971, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FidAlp SA, à Aigle, CHE-111.789.875 (FOSC du 17.09.2018, p. 0/1004456915). Statuts modifiés le 13.01.2021. Les 150 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000, formant la totalité du capital-actions, sont converties en 150 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts. Gianni Ingo n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1004456915, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FidAlp SA, à Aigle, CHE-111.789.875 (FOSC du 17.08.2018, p. 0/4421823). Statuts modifiés le 6 septembre 2018.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courriel ou par écrit. Orgeco, Organisation et Gestion Commerciales SA (CHE-107.862.492) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 6 septembre 2018, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: 4421823, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FidAlp SA, à Aigle, CHE-111.789.875 (FOSC du 21.02.2017, p. 0/3361549).
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Gianni Ingo, de Bodio, à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.