Address
c/o Bernet + Lehner Treuhand AG
Bankstrasse 7
8750 Glarus
Reports for Ferropol GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ferropol GmbH
- Ferropol GmbH has its legal headquarters in Glarus, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company Ferropol GmbH consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 24.07.1952.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.07.2013. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Ferropol GmbH is registered in the Canton of GL under the UID CHE-101.860.773.
- Next to the company Ferropol GmbH there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Attic-Bau AG, Bernet & Lehner Treuhand AG, Bovita-Stiftung.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.07.1952
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.4.002.385-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.860.773
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Import von Eisen- und Stahlwaren, Fabrikation und Vertrieb von Eisen- und Metallwaren und technischen Artikeln, sowie Handel mit Sportartikeln. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichen oder ähnlichen Firmen beteiligen und Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ferropol GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 952017, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Ferropol GmbH, in Glarus, CH-160.4.002.385-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2007, S. 13, Publ. 4259742). Mit Erklärung vom 24.06.2013 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bosshard-Siem, Hans, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshard, Erich, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: 4259742, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Ferropol GmbH, in Glarus, CH-160.4.002.385-2, Import von Eisen- und Stahlwaren, Fabrikation und Vertrieb von Eisen- und Metallwaren und technischen Artikeln, sowie Handel mit Sportartikeln usw., Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.1989, S. 837).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshard, Erich, von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bosshard, Rudolf, von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Ferropol GmbH, in Glarus . Eisen- und Stahlwaren (SHAB Nr.9 vom 14.1.1981, S.132).
Neues Domizil:
c/o Bernet & Lehner Treuhand AG, Bankstrasse 7.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.