Reports for FeRo Handels AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FeRo Handels AG
- FeRo Handels AG has its legal headquarters in Oberbüren and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- FeRo Handels AG was founded on 03.12.2008.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.03.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-114.615.421.
Management (5)
newest board members
Felix Christof Keller,
Patrick Stephan Keller,
Thomas Keller,
Felix Walter Keller,
Margeritha Esther Keller
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Felix Christof Keller,
Patrick Stephan Keller,
Thomas Keller,
Felix Walter Keller,
Margeritha Esther Keller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.12.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberbüren
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.064.394-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.615.421
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Baumaterialien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FeRo Handels AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005432658, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FeRo Handels AG, in Oberbüren, CHE-114.615.421, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2019, Publ. 1004564522).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Felix Christof, von Huttwil, in Niederwil SG (Oberbüren), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Oberbüren].
Publication number: HR02-1004564522, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FeRo Handels AG, in Oberbüren, CHE-114.615.421, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 19.06.2012, S.0, Publ. 6725522).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Felix Christof, von Huttwil, in Oberbüren, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Keller, Patrick Stephan, von Huttwil, in Bischofszell, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Keller, Thomas, von Huttwil, in Niederwil SG (Oberbüren), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Oberbüren, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 6725522, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
FeRo Handels AG, in Oberbüren, CH-320.3.064.394-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 09.12.2008, S. 15, Publ. 4770306).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fraefel, Roman, von Bischofszell und Uzwil, in Bischofszell, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Felix, von Huttwil, in Zihlschlacht (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Keller, Margeritha Esther, von Huttwil, in Zihlschlacht (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Keller, Thomas, von Huttwil, in Oberbüren, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.