Branches (1)
Reports for Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl
- Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Sion and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Agriculture (various)».
- The management of the company Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.12.2019.
- In the commercial register the company Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-106.837.072.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.01.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.4.004.241-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.837.072
Sector
Agriculture (various)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation et la gestion de biens agricoles, l'exercice de toutes activités dans le domaine agricole; la société peut acquérir des biens-fonds ainsi que des immeubles, les grever, les aliéner et les administrer (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LA, Location d'Attelage Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004782002, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-106.837.072, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 224 du 19.11.2019, Publ. 1004763105).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cantacuzène, Alexis, de Kerzers, à Conthey, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 2 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: HR02-1004763105, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
LA, Location d'Attelage Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-106.837.072, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 209 du 28.10.2015, p.0, Publ. 2450327).
Modification des statuts:
07.11.2019.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Ferme Ecurie des Ronquoz Sàrl.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Ronquoz 200, 1950 Sion.
Nouveau but:
L'exploitation et la gestion de biens agricoles, l'exercice de toutes activités dans le domaine agricole;
la société peut acquérir des biens-fonds ainsi que des immeubles, les grever, les aliéner et les administrer (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cantacuzène, Alexis, de Kerzers, à Conthey, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 2 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00];
Pollini Cantacuzène, Marisa Graziella, de Conthey, à Conthey, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 18 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Publication number: 2450327, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
LA, Location d'Attelage Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-106.837.072, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 244 du 16.12.2009, p. 22, Publ. 5396544).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Pollini, Giuseppe, citoyen italien, à Sion, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Walpen, Giovanna, de Reckingen, à Bex, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cantacuzène, Alexis, de Kerzers, à Conthey, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: gérant avec signature individuelle, sans part sociale].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.