Reports for Fenster Bünter AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fenster Bünter AG
- Fenster Bünter AG has its legal headquarters in Büren NW and is active. It operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods».
- The management of the company Fenster Bünter AG, which was founded on the 21.04.2021, consists of 6 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company Fenster Bünter AG is registered under the UID CHE-384.037.447.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Erika Kaeser,
Basil Stefan Gasser,
Simone Gasser,
Josef Fluder,
Patrik Sicher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.04.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberdorf (NW)
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-150.3.477.530-8
UID/VAT
CHE-384.037.447
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Fabrikation von baugewerblichen Produkten, insbesondere Fenstern sowie den Handel mit baugewerblichen Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Stans | 26.04.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fenster Bünter AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006091397, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Fenster Bünter AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-384.037.447, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 12.07.2024, Publ. 1006082877).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheuber, Fredy Josef, von Oberdorf (NW), in Oberdorf (NW), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006082877, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Fenster Bünter AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-384.037.447, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 11.04.2023, Publ. 1005720223).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bünter, Josef, von Wolfenschiessen, in Hergiswil (NW), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zangger, Elisabeth, von Dagmersellen, in Willisau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaeser, Erika, von Fribourg, in Ennetbürgen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005720223, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Fenster Bünter AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-384.037.447, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 26.04.2021, Publ. 1005159330).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Basil, von Naters, in Oberkirch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gasser, Simone, von Naters, in Wolhusen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bünter, Josef, von Wolfenschiessen, in Hergiswil (NW), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zangger, Elisabeth, von Dagmersellen, in Willisau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.