Reports for Fahrny & Partenaires SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fahrny & Partenaires SA
- Fahrny & Partenaires SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Neuchâtel. Fahrny & Partenaires SA belongs to the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 02.05.2017.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.08.2024.
- Fahrny & Partenaires SA is registered in the Canton of NE under the UID CHE-241.066.486.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Jérôme Dupont, Peak Physiothérapie Sàrl, Unilabs, Laboratoire d'analyses médicales SA, succursale de Neuchâtel.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Lehmann,
Claude-Alain Fahrny,
Sylvain Vernez,
Christophe Hayoz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.05.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuchâtel
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.116.058-2
UID/VAT
CHE-241.066.486
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un bureau d'étude traitant toutes les activités en rapport avec l'architecture y compris la rénovation et la transformation, également d'une entreprise intégrale de construction de bâtiments, ainsi que courtage d'immeubles.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fahrny Architectes SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fahrny & Partenaires SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116624, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fahrny & Partenaires SA, à Neuchâtel, CHE-241.066.486 (FOSC du 05.04.2024, p. 0/1006002428). La procuration de Carrete Pereira Maria Trinidad est radiée. Lehmann Thomas, membre du conseil d'administration, signe désormais individuellement;
ses pouvoirs sont modifiés en ce sens.
Publication number: HR02-1006002428, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fahrny & Partenaires SA, à Neuchâtel, CHE-241.066.486 (FOSC du 12.05.2023, p. 0/1005745550). Carrete Pereira Maria Trinidad n'est plus directrice;
elle continue de signer collectivement à deux, mais désormais par procuration et sauf avec Fahrny Claude-Alain. Fahrny Claude-Alain n'est plus membre du conseil d'administration;
il signe désormais par procuration, collectivement à deux, sauf avec Carrete Pereira Maria Trinidad. Lehmann Thomas, de Lauperswil, à La Neuveville, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005745550, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fahrny Architectes SA, à Neuchâtel, CHE-241.066.486 (FOSC du 19.08.2021, p. 0/1005274182).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Fahrny & Partenaires SA.
But modifié:
exploitation d'un bureau d'étude traitant toutes les activités en rapport avec l'architecture y compris la rénovation et la transformation, également d'une entreprise intégrale de construction de bâtiments, ainsi que courtage d'immeubles.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier recommandé, téléfax, courrier électronique ou avis inséré dans la Feuille officielle suisse du commerce. Statuts modifiés le 29.03.2023 et le 04.05.2023. Vernez Sylvain, de Valbroye, à Vully-les-Lacs, président, et Hayoz Christophe, de et à Cressier (FR), sont membres du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.