Reports for Etimark AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Etimark AG
- Etimark AG has its legal headquarters in Grabs, is active and operates in the sector «Production and processing of paper and carboard goods».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 01.05.1978.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 18.12.2017.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-107.930.544.
- At the moment, the company Etimark AG has 2 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- Companies with the same address as Etimark AG: SCHUBRO Immobilien AG, SCHUBRO Labels AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.05.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grabs
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.017.466-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.930.544
Sector
Production and processing of paper and carboard goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Druckerei, Handel mit Druckereierzeugnissen sowie Herstellung und Vertrieb von Etikettiersystemen. Die Gesellschaft kann Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, veräus-sern und verwalten sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TEAG Advisors AG | Grabs | 10.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
04.10.2019 | active | 05264/2019 | |
ETIMARK | 21.05.1980 | active | 00405/1980 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Etimark AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3937717, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Etimark AG, in Grabs, CHE-107.930.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 02.10.2017, Publ. 3783609).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schister, Herbert, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hünenberg See (Hünenberg), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Trübbach (Wartau)].
Publication number: 3783609, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Etimark AG, in Grabs, CHE-107.930.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 10.07.2015, Publ. 2263041).
Domizil neu:
Werdenstrasse 90, 9472 Grabs.
Publication number: 2263041, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Etimark AG, in Grabs, CHE-107.930.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 29.05.2012, Publ. 6694004).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grabuschnigg, Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Übersaxen (AT), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.