Reports for Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA
- Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA in Moutier is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA is active.
- Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA has one person entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.03.2022.
- Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.200.204.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.03.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Moutier
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.006.395-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.200.204
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but: l'exploitation d'un atelier d'architecture. La société peut: acheter et vendre des immeubles; exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire P. Gobat S.A. | Moutier | <2004 | 02.02.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Chavanne Etienne Moutier SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Etienne Chavanne Moutier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005432292, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Etienne Chavanne Moutier S.A., à Moutier, CHE-107.200.204, société anonyme (No. FOSC 127 du 03.07.2020, Publ. 1004927697).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Haldemann, Yvonnick, de Eggiwil, à Rebeuvelier (Courrendlin), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Leuenberger, Daniel, de Rüderswil, à Moutier, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: HR02-1004927697, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Etienne Chavanne Moutier S.A., à Moutier, CHE-107.200.204, société anonyme (No. FOSC 24 du 03.02.2011, p.4, Publ. 6015582).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Crêt 34, 2740 Moutier.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Leuenberger, Daniel, de Rüderswil, à Moutier, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Haldemann, Yvonnick, de Eggiwil, à Rebeuvelier (Courrendlin), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Rebeuvelier, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 6015582, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Etienne Chavanne Moutier S.A., à Moutier, CH-073.3.006.395-6, société anonyme (No. FOSC 169 du 01.09.2004, p. 4, Publ. 2429852).
Modification des statuts:
29.06.2010.
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but: l'exploitation d'un atelier d'architecture.
La société peut:
acheter et vendre des immeubles;
exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Nouveaux faits qualifiés:
[La disposition statutaire sur les apports en nature et la reprise de biens lors de la fondation du 12.03.1997 est abrogée] [biffé: Apports en nature/Reprise de biens : la société reprend de la raison individuelle non inscrite au registre du commerce 'Etienne Chavannes', à Moutier, les actifs de CHF 255'875.90 et les passifs de CHF 99'709.70 selon bilan de reprise au 31.12.1996 pour le prix de CHF 156'166.20, correspondant à l'actif net, dont CHF 100'000.-- sont imputés sur le capital-actions, le solde par CHF 56'166.20 étant crédité au compte courant de l'apportant.].Selon déclaration du 29.06.2010, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire P. Gobat S.A., à Moutier, organe de révision;
Chavanne, Etienne, de Coeuve, à Moutier, président, avec signature collective à deux avec Leuenberger Daniel ou Haldemann Yvonnick.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Leuenberger, Daniel, de Rüderswil, à Moutier, président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur avec signature collective à deux avec Chavanne Etienne ou Haldemann Yvonnick];
Haldemann, Yvonnick, de Eggiwil, à Rebeuvelier, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur avec signature collective à deux avec Chavanne Etienne ou Leuenberger Daniel].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.