About ETABLISSEMENT JEVA
- The management of the company ETABLISSEMENT JEVA, which was founded on the 07.10.1958, consists of 2 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 23.03.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Alpla Aktiengesellschaft, ANSTALT LAHAN, Ante Consulting GmbH have the same address as ETABLISSEMENT JEVA.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for ETABLISSEMENT JEVA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2682/2022, (1)
ETABLISSEMENT JEVA, in Vaduz, FL-0001.009.460-2, Anstalt.
Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu:
c/o Revalier Aktiengesellschaft, Pradafant 11, 9490 Vaduz.
Publication number: 20240780, (1)
Handelsregister 07.09.2018, ETABLISSEMENT JEVA, Vaduz (FL-0001.009.460-2) Anstalt Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: Wohlwend, Reinhold Viktor, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 20210506, (1)
Handelsregister 24/05/2016, ETABLISSEMENT JEVA, Vaduz (FL-0001.009.460-2) Anstalt Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend: Wohlwend, Reinhold, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.