Address
c/o Administration communale
Rue du Collège 9
1186 Essertines-sur-Rolle
Reports for EssairVent SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EssairVent SA
- EssairVent SA from Essertines-sur-Rolle operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities» and is active.
- The company was founded on 26.10.2010 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 09.08.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-116.138.018.
- Companies with the same address as EssairVent SA: Bureau Technique conseil électricité-hydraulique, Marc de Wurstemberger, enessert société coopérative.
Management (5)
newest board members
Valérie Marie-Pomme Moinat Bille,
Fabian Möller,
Robin Koch,
Jean-Luc Zanasco,
Jérôme Barras
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Essertines-sur-Rolle
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.077.294-4
UID/VAT
CHE-116.138.018
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le développement, l'installation, le management et la gestion, en Suisse, de sites de production d'énergie renouvelable, en particulier de sites d'énergie éolienne; ainsi que la production et la vente en Suisse et à l'étranger d'énergie électrique provenant de sources renouvelables, spécialement de provenance éolienne. La société peut: participer à toutes entreprises ou sociétés quelconques; acquérir, gérer et vendre des biens mobiliers ou immobiliers à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE); effectuer toutes opérations pour son compte ou à titre fiduciaire, tant en Suisse qu'à l'étranger.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | 12.07.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 01.11.2010 | 11.07.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EssairVent SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006103763, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EssairVent SA, à Essertines-sur-Rolle, CHE-116.138.018 (FOSC du 12.06.2024, p. 0/1006055266). Dufour Samuel, inscrit sans signature, n'est plus administrateur. Moinat Bille Valérie Marie-Pomme, de Lavigny, à Essertines-sur-Rolle, est membre du conseil d'administration, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1006055266, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EssairVent SA, à Essertines-sur-Rolle, CHE-116.138.018 (FOSC du 20.03.2024, p. 0/1005990602). Statuts modifiés le 05.06.2024.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but le développement, l'installation, le management et la gestion, en Suisse, de sites de production d'énergie renouvelable, en particulier de sites d'énergie éolienne;
ainsi que la production et la vente en Suisse et à l'étranger d'énergie électrique provenant de sources renouvelables, spécialement de provenance éolienne.
La société peut:
participer à toutes entreprises ou sociétés quelconques;
acquérir, gérer et vendre des biens mobiliers ou immobiliers à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE);
effectuer toutes opérations pour son compte ou à titre fiduciaire, tant en Suisse qu'à l'étranger.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par insertion dans la Feuille officielle suisse du commerce ou par écrit ou par voie électronique.
Publication number: HR02-1005990602, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
EssairVent SA, à Essertines-sur-Rolle, CHE-116.138.018 (FOSC du 22.08.2023, p. 0/1005821384). Finkel Joachim et Walz Horst ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Barras Jérôme, qui n'est plus président, est nommé vice-président. Koch Robin, de Schötz, à Staffelbach, avec signature collective à deux, et Möller Fabian, de Basel, à Reinach (BL), président, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.