Reports for Eschtec AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Eschtec AG
- Eschtec AG has its legal headquarters in Müllheim Dorf and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Manufacturing of car bodies, trailers and accessories».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 26.05.2008.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 08.01.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Eschtec AG is the following: CHE-114.317.662.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Eschler,
Max Eschler,
Gabriella Amort,
Rolf Trüb,
Lilli Eschler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Müllheim
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.021.230-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.317.662
Sector
Manufacturing of car bodies, trailers and accessories
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Forschung, Entwicklung, Beratung, Schulung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von sowie Handel mit mechanischen, elektrischen, pneumatischen und hydraulischen Komponenten, Geräten, Maschinen und Fahrzeugen. Die Gesellschaft kann Patente, Konzessionen, Lizenzen im Vertragsverhältnis vergeben oder in eigener Regie verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, insbesondere alle der Verwirklichung ihres Zweckes förderlichen kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen und veräussern sowie Kapitalanlagen aller Art halten und verwerten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden | Weinfelden | 09.06.2020 | 07.01.2024 | |
Treuhandbüro Norbert Hutter AG | Elgg | 30.05.2008 | 06.10.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Eschtec AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005928098, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Eschtec AG, in Müllheim, CHE-114.317.662, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2022, Publ. 1005615401). Gemäss Erklärung vom 01.11.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden (CHE-101.810.516), in Weinfelden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005615401, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Eschtec AG, in Müllheim, CHE-114.317.662, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 09.06.2020, Publ. 1004906326).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wieland, Andreas, von Sufers, in Herdern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004906326, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Eschtec AG, in Müllheim, CHE-114.317.662, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 19.09.2017, Publ. 3759955).
Statutenänderung:
03.06.2020.
Aktien neu:
4'000'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.10 [bisher: 400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Max Eschler, in Müllheim, gemäss Vertrag vom 23.05.2008 und Bilanz per 31.12.2007 mit Aktiven von CHF 1'445'639.44 und Passiven von CHF 845'979.10 zum Preis von CHF 599'660.34, wofür 400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 199'660.34 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.]. [Der Verzicht auf eine eingeschränkte Revision wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Die Gesellschaft hat mit Erklärung vom 29.09.2015 auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eschler, Thomas, von Boltigen, in Gundetswil (Wiesendangen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Eschler, Lilli, von Boltigen, in Gundetswil (Wiesendangen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Eschler, Lilly, in Gundetswil (Bertschikon), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eschler, Max, von Boltigen, in Gundetswil (Wiesendangen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Gundetswil (Bertschikon), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden (CHE-101.810.516) [ CH-440.3.014.219-5], in Weinfelden, Revisionsstelle;
Trüb, Rolf, von Zollikon, in Wagenhausen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Pfyn];
Wieland, Andreas, von Sufers, in Herdern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.