Reports for Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus
- Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Kölliken. Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof» and is currently active.
- Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.06.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus is the following: CHE-102.184.584.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: RETUS Handels AG, Retus HEBO Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.02.1957
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kölliken
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.000.408-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.184.584
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Maschinenfabrik sowie Vertrieb der hergestellten Maschinen und Werkzeuge im In- und Ausland; die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern sowie sich an Unternehmungen verwandter Art beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Suisse AG | St. Gallen | 26.05.2021 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORGANISATIONS UND TREUHAND AG | Baden | 26.07.2019 | 25.05.2021 | |
Confia Baden AG | Baden | 28.03.2014 | 25.07.2019 | |
AWB Revisionen AG | Aarau | 07.04.2006 | 27.03.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Retus | 01.12.2017 | active | 59012/2017 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005781867, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus, in Kölliken, CHE-102.184.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 13.05.2022, Publ. 1005473332).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bärtschi, Gerhard, von Eggiwil, in Lostorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Suter, Bruno, von Kölliken, in Kölliken, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Suter, Michael, von Kölliken, in Kölliken, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005473332, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus, in Kölliken, CHE-102.184.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192770).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Herbert, von Kölliken, in Kölliken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Bruno, von Kölliken, in Kölliken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005192770, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Erwin Suter AG, Maschinenfabrik Retus, in Kölliken, CHE-102.184.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2019, Publ. 1004685303).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
ORGANISATIONS UND TREUHAND AG (CHE-408.651.344), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Audit Suisse AG (CHE-112.451.953), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.