Address
c/o Hannes Heinimann
Steinerstrasse 16
3006 Bern
Reports for Ernst Peyer Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ernst Peyer Stiftung
- Ernst Peyer Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 8 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.04.2023.
- The organization Ernst Peyer Stiftung is registered under the UID CHE-109.813.984.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Julia Verena Peyer,
Walter Esposito,
Jürg Frei,
Hans Peter Willi,
Rahel Efua Briggen
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Julia Verena Peyer,
Walter Esposito,
Jürg Frei,
Hans Peter Willi,
Rahel Efua Briggen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.03.2002
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.7.014.228-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.813.984
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung oder Unterstützung von humanitären Hilfsprojekten in Ghana im Sinn und Geist von Pfarrer Ernst Peyer selig.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Interconsulta Revisions- und Treuhand AG | Zürich | 23.09.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ernst Peyer Gedenk-Stiftung Schweiz
- Peyer Ernst Gedenk-Stiftung Schweiz
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ernst Peyer Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005717624, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Peyer Stiftung, in Bern, CHE-109.813.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2023, Publ. 1005649398).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hofmann, Katharina, von Zollikon, in Oberrieden, Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates [bisher: in Veltheim AG];
Peyer, Julia Verena, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Schindellegi (Feusisberg), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Publication number: HR02-1005649398, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Peyer Stiftung, in Bern, CHE-109.813.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 21.10.2022, Publ. 1005588127).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lang, Alfred, von Zürich, in Uetikon am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Publication number: HR02-1005588127, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Peyer Stiftung, in Bern, CHE-109.813.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 25.03.2022, Publ. 1005435400).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ingold, Hans Rudolf, von Lüterkofen-Ichertswil, in Kyburg-Buchegg (Buchegg), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Esposito, Walter, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Frei, Jürg, von Silenen, in Wabern (Köniz), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.