Reports for Ernst Egger AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ernst Egger AG
- Ernst Egger AG has its legal headquarters in Grafenried and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Dealing in automotive accessories».
- The company was founded on 08.11.1948.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 26.08.2015.
- Ernst Egger AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-101.379.122.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.11.1948
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fraubrunnen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.000.986-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.379.122
Sector
Dealing in automotive accessories
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwertung von Autos, Fabrikation und Handel mit Anhängern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und alle Geschäfte abschliessen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Liegenschaften erwerben und wieder veräussern, auch wenn dies nicht unmittelbar mit dem Geschäftsbetrieb zusammenhängt.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Equitest AG Treuhand und Wirtschaftsprüfungen | Wettingen | 12.01.1996 | 04.10.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Egger Ernst AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ernst Egger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2339277, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Egger AG, in Fraubrunnen, CHE-101.379.122, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2015, Publ. 1995701).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egger, Rolf, von Aarwangen, in Quartino (Magadino), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Egger, Renate, von Aarwangen, in Quartino (Magadino), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Egger, Manuelle, von Aarwangen, in Quartino (Magadino), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Khatib, Ali, von Schüpfheim, in Weiningen ZH, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1995701, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Egger AG, in Grafenried, CHE-101.379.122, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2011, Publ. 6362560).
Sitz neu:
Fraubrunnen. [Sitzänderung von Amtes wegen infolge Gemeindefusion.].
Publication number: 6362560, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Ernst Egger AG, in Grafenried, CH-053.3.000.986-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2005, S. 3, Publ. 2931114).
Statutenänderung:
27.09.2011.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwertung von Autos, Fabrikation und Handel mit Anhängern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und alle Geschäfte abschliessen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Liegenschaften erwerben und wieder veräussern, auch wenn dies nicht unmittelbar mit dem Geschäftsbetrieb zusammenhängt.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich, mit Telefax oder elektronischer Post. Gemäss Erklärung vom 27.09.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
R. Kummer-Treuhand, in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.