Reports for ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg
- ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg is currently active and the industry «Operation of investment companies». The legal headquarters are in Laufenburg.
- The management of the company ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg, which was founded on the 24.06.1965, consists of 6 persons.
- On the 18.03.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.124.773.
- There are 12 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: 21 HOLD AG, AGSM AG, Detela AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Christoph Alexander Erne,
Daniel Erich Erne,
Erich Viktor Erne,
Rudolf Erne
newest authorized signatories
Roger Wyss,
Diana Bongo,
Christoph Alexander Erne,
Daniel Erich Erne,
Erich Viktor Erne
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.06.1965
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Laufenburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.920.201-5
UID/VAT
CHE-107.124.773
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art; die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ERNE AG Bauunternehmung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005988104, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, CHE-107.124.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 29.12.2023, Publ. 1005923699).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyss, Roger, von Breitenbach, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005923699, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, CHE-107.124.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2023, Publ. 1005900214).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brühlmeier, Thomas, von Wettingen, in Döttingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005900214, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ERNE Holding AG Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, CHE-107.124.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 27.10.2023, Publ. 1005870925).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bongo, Diana, von Stein (AG), in Eiken, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.