Head office
Other branches (9)
Reports for ERNE AG Bauunternehmung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ERNE AG Bauunternehmung
- ERNE AG Bauunternehmung has its legal headquarters in Basel, is active and operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The management of the company ERNE AG Bauunternehmung consists of 0 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 07.11.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-173.904.501.
- Companies with the same address as ERNE AG Bauunternehmung: B & B Dienstleistungen GmbH, ERNE AG Holzbau, ERNE decon AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.04.2005
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.9.001.260-2
UID/VAT
CHE-173.904.501
CHE-110.353.363 VAT
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Bau-, Kies- und Betonunternehmung sowie Handel mit und Vertrieb von Baumaterialien und Bauprodukten; die Gesellschaft kann als General- oder Totalunternehmerin Bauten erstellen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Wertschriften kaufen und verkaufen, Finanzanlagen tätigen und Darlehen gewähren, in den Bereichen Handel, Entwicklung, Produktion und Service von Hard- und Software der Informatik und Kommunikationstechnik tätig sein, Dritte im Informatik- und Kommunikationsbereich beraten und sich an anderen IT Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ERNE AG Bauunternehmung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005878500, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
ERNE AG Bauunternehmung, in Basel, CHE-173.904.501, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2023, Publ. 1005860156).
Hauptsitz in:
Laufenburg (HR Aarau).
Domizil neu:
Hüningerstrasse 46, 4056 Basel.
Publication number: HR02-1005860156, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
ERNE AG Bauunternehmung, in Basel, CHE-173.904.501, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2008, S.6, Publ. 4355252).
Hauptsitz in:
Laufenburg (HR Aarau).
Domizil neu:
c/o LIVIT AG, Hüningerstrasse 46, 4056 Basel.
Publication number: 4355252, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
ERNE AG Bauunternehmung, in Basel, CH-270.9.001.260-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 17.08.2007, S. 5, Publ. 4070238).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Laufenburg (HR Aarau).
Firma Hauptsitz:
ERNE AG Bauunternehmung (CH-400.3.024.979-8).
Statuten Hauptsitz:
[gestrichen: Statuten Hauptsitz: 04.12.2003] [gestrichen: Statuten Hauptsitz: 20.07.2007].
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
[gestrichen: Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz: 17.12.2003].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
[gestrichen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Erne, Erich, von Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Erne, Rudolf, von Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Erne, Daniel, von Laufenburg, in Laufenburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frei, Peter, von Leuggern, in Leibstadt, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schnetzler, Urs, von Kaisten, in Kaisten, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Juen, Beat, von Birsfelden, in Oberwil BL, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gasser, René, von Hallau, in Rheinfelden, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Buser, Gérard, von Gelterkinden, in Neuwiller (FR), Geschäftsführer der Zweigniederlassung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hossmann, Thomas, von Braggio, in Oberwil BL, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.