Reports for Erdgas Ostschweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Erdgas Ostschweiz AG
- Erdgas Ostschweiz AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Zürich. Erdgas Ostschweiz AG belongs to the industry «Extraction of and supply with natural gas» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Erdgas Ostschweiz AG, which was founded on the 25.02.1966, consists of 13 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Erdgas Ostschweiz AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-107.831.362.
Management (13)
newest board members
Sebastian Rost,
Marco Gabathuler,
Andreas Breitenmoser,
Peter Wieland,
Andres Reto Türler
Executive board
Lukas Andreas Weber,
Patrik Philippe Schmid,
Andreas Marc Bolliger
newest authorized signatories
Lukas Andreas Weber,
Patrik Philippe Schmid,
Andres Reto Türler,
Peter Hubertus Jans,
Andreas Marc Bolliger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.02.1966
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.909.861-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.831.362
Sector
Extraction of and supply with natural gas
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Transport von Erdgas, damit verbundene Dienstleistungen und den Bau, Betrieb und Unterhalt der dazu notwendigen Infrastruktur, unter Gewährleistung eines adäquaten Sicherheitsstandards für den Betrieb der Infrastruktur. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen, Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen und im übrigen alles vorkehren, was zur Erreichung ihres Zweckes förderlich ist.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Erdgas Ostschweiz AG.
- Gasverbund Ostschweiz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Erdgas Ostschweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006114683, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Erdgas Ostschweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.831.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 24.05.2024, Publ. 1006038669).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zillig, Ivo Franco, von Muolen, in Weinfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1006038669, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Erdgas Ostschweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.831.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 04.04.2022, Publ. 1005441549).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brütsch, Roger André, von Ramsen, in Flurlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zysset, Marc, von Köniz, in Galgenen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Breitenmoser, Andreas, von Appenzell und Wil (SG), in Wil (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Appenzell];
Rost, Sebastian, von Dachsen, in Feuerthalen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zillig, Ivo Franco, von Muolen, in Weinfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zinsli, Andrea, von Urmein, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Zürich];
Bolliger, Andreas, von Küttigen, in Hünenberg, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wettingen].
Publication number: HR02-1005441549, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Erdgas Ostschweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.831.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2022, Publ. 1005373474).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneider, Roger, von Rüthi SG, in Au SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gabathuler, Marco, von Chur, in Chur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.