Address
c/o Niklaus Lüchinger
Grossmünsterplatz 8
8001 Zürich
Reports for EQUAM Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EQUAM Stiftung
- EQUAM Stiftung with its legal headquarters in Zürich is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». EQUAM Stiftung is active.
- The management consists of 11 persons. The organization was founded on 23.09.1999.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.02.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-108.180.722.
- 4 trademarks or applications for trademarks of the organization EQUAM Stiftung are registered at the IPI.
- There are 32 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: A. Rambosson AG, Alice Schoch-Bockhorn-Stiftung, Bertola AG.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Flavia Alessandra Wasserfallen,
Dr. Luca Emmanuele,
lic. iur. Ruth Cornelia Humbel Näf,
Dr. Felix Huber,
Károly Christian Köpe
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Joël Thomas Lehmann,
lic. iur. Ruth Cornelia Humbel Näf,
Dr. Felix Huber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.09.1999
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.695-4
UID/VAT
CHE-108.180.722
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der externen, unabhängigen Qualitätssicherung und -kontrolle in der medizinischen Versorgung, insbesondere in Managed Care-Modellen und -Organisationen; soll zur Schlichtung von Konflikten zwischen Leistungsträgern und Patienten beitragen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Lehmann AG | Bern | 17.01.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revitas AG | Bern | 07.10.2014 | 16.01.2022 | |
NOVISA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zürich | 21.08.2008 | 06.10.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
26.09.2002 | active | 06132/2002 | |
05.09.2000 | deleted | 03571/2000 |
Newest SOGC notifications: EQUAM Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005678572, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EQUAM Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.180.722, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570393).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ermanni, Dr. Massimo, von Bissone, in La Chaux-de-Fonds, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005570393, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EQUAM Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.180.722, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2022, Publ. 1005381734).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ziltener, Erika, von Schübelbach, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wasserfallen, Flavia, von Ferenbalm, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005381734, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
EQUAM Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.180.722, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2021, Publ. 1005127892).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revitas AG (CHE-322.480.911), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand Lehmann AG (CHE-107.818.835), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.