Reports for ENVECO Machinery SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ENVECO Machinery SA
- ENVECO Machinery SA is currently active and the industry «Trading with machines». The legal headquarters are in Aigle.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 14.02.2000.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.01.2021.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-105.431.224.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.02.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aigle
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.171.181-4
UID/VAT
CHE-105.431.224
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'importation, l'exportation, l'assemblage et le commerce de tous biens, particulièrement dans le domaine des machines, des moteurs à combustion et des équipements de haute technologie, ainsi que le conseil dans ces mêmes domaines.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audict fiduciaire SA | Pully | <2004 | 28.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ENVECO Machinery SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005071807, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ENVECO Machinery SA, à Aigle, CHE-105.431.224 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Panos Dimitrios est maintenant à Epalinges et Panos Ilias à Montreux.
Publication number: 932447, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ENVECO Machinery SA, à Pully, CH-550-0171181-4 (FOSC du 29.12.2008, p. 33/4805174). Statuts modifiés le 13 juin 2013. Siège transféré à Aigle.
Nouvelle adresse:
rue du Bourg 34, 1860 Aigle. Panos Dimitrios est maintenant à Singapour (Singapour).
Publication number: 4805174, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ENVECO Machinery SA, à Pully, CH-550-0171181-4, assemblage et commerce de tout bien (FOSC du 15.04.2008, p. 16/4431300). Statuts modifiés le 10 décembre 2008.
Nouveau but:
l'importation, l'exportation, l'assemblage et le commerce de tous biens, particulièrement dans le domaine des machines, des moteurs à combustion et des équipements de haute technologie, ainsi que le conseil dans ces mêmes domaines (pour but complet cf. statuts). Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 10 décembre 2008, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Audict fiduciaire SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.